MULTIPLICATION WITH MULTIPLES OF ELEVEN

MULTIPLICATION WITH MULTIPLES OF ELEVEN

– By Mithali

Observe following a set of problems and their products:
55 x22 = 1210
55×33 = 1815
55x 44 = 2420
In each case 55 is multiplied by multiples of 11.
First, two digits (left side numbers) are the product of 6 and multiplier (6×3, 6×4, 6×5)
Last two digits (right most digits) are direct multiplications of unit digit numbers
Very easy, but how?
55 x 11 is 605. If this product, 605 is multiplied by 2 or 3 or any other number, the product is easily predictable. 605 x 2 is equivalent to 55 x 22. Similarly 55x 33 is 605 x 3.

555 x 33 = 18315
555x 55 =30525
555 x 77 = 42735
Clearly one can see the similarity in multiplicand and multiplier.
Here the product is 5 digit number. Right most two numbers are a multiplication of unit place digits. Central number is multiple of 11 of the multiplier. ( 3, 5. 7 respectively in the above example)
Left two digits are again 6 times the multiple of 11

Please note that 555 x 33 =55×333
555 x 77 = 55 x 777
Perhaps, this does not need any explanation

Observe the interesting relation in the product of 11 and two digit number ending with 9
11 x 19 = 209
11 x 29 = 319
11 x 39 = 429

11 x 79 = 869

There is lot of fun in playing with numbers
24.04.2016
Observe following relation between numbers:
0*9+1= 1
1×9+2=11
12×9+3=111
123×9+4=1111

12345678×9 +9 = 111111111
123459789×9+10=1111111111

1×8+1=9
12×8+2=98
123×8+3=987
1234 x 8 +4 = 9876

123456789×8+9= 987654321

142857×1=142857
142857×2=285714
142857×3=428571
142857×4=571428
142857×5=714285
142857×6=857142

8×9+9 =92, 14×15+15 = 152 6×7+7=72 10×11+11 =112
8×9-8=82 14×15-14 =142 6×7-6=62 10×11-10=102
OR,
Any number a x (a+1) + (a+1) = (a+1)2
a x (a+1) – a = a2

8 x10 + 1 = 81 = 92 7 x 9 + 1 = 64 = 82 5 x 7 + 1 = 36 = 62
(A-1) x (A +1) +1 = a2

82 + 8 + 9 = 81 = 92 122 + 12 + 13 = 169 = 132 252 +25 +26 = 676 = 262
82 – 8 -7 = 49 = 72 122 +12 – 11 = 121 = 112 252 -25 -24 = 576 =242
A2 + A + (A+1) = (A+1) 2
A2 – A – (A-1) = (A-1) 2

2 x 3 x 4 + 3 = 3^3 3 x 4 x 5 + 4 = 4^3 5 x 6 x 7 + 6 = 6^3
(a – 1) x (a) x (a + 1) + a = a^3

Ask your friend / s to write a number. Below that he has to write another number.
Now the third number is the sum of above two numbers (1st + 2nd number = 3rd number)
Next number will be the sum of 2nd and 3rd number (2nd + 3rd number = 4th number)
This goes on till 10th number. Then ask your friend to add them. Before he completes writing all 10 numbers , you can write the sum:
Let us take 2 and 4 as first and second number
2
4
6
10
16
26
42 < -- 7th Number 68 110 178 462 sum There are two methods to solve this problem: When they reach 7th number, you multiply that number by 11. It is the sum of all ten numbers. (Multiplying by 11 is very easy) Seventh number is 5 times first number plus 8 times second number (2x5 + 4x8 = 10 +32 =42). Eleven times this number (42) is the sum of all these ten numbers ಗಣಿತದಲ್ಲಿ ಮಕ್ಕಳಲ್ಲಿ ಅಂಕಗಳನ್ನು ಕೂಡಿಸುವ ವೇಗ ಹೆಚ್ಚಿಸಲು ಈ ಆಟ ಆಡಬಹುದು. (ಇದನ್ನು ನಾವು ಆಡಿಲ್ಲ. ಓದಿರುವ ಗಣಿತದ ಸೂತ್ರದ ಸಹಾಯದಿಂದ ಈ ಆಟ ಕಲ್ಪಿಸಿದ್ದೇನೆ). ಇದರಲ್ಲಿ ಶಿಕ್ಷಕ / ಶಿಕ್ಷಕಿ ಯರೂ ಸೇರ ಬೇಕು. ಯಾವುದಾದರೂ ಒಬ್ಬ ಒಂದು ಅಂಕೆ / ಸಂಕೆ ಹೇಳಬೇಕು. ಇದು ಮೊದಲ ಅಂಕೆ/ ಸಂಕೆ. ಇನ್ನೊಬ್ಬ ಎರಡನೆಯ ಅಮ್ಕೆ/ಸಂಕೆ ಹೇಳಬೆಕು. ಮೊದಲನೆಯ ಮತ್ತು ಎರಡನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆಗಳನ್ನು ಕೂಡಿಸಿದರೆ, ಮೂರನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ಸಿಗುತ್ತದೆ. ಹಾಗೆಯೆ ಎರಡನೆಯ ಮತ್ತು ಮೂರನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ಕೂಡಿಸಿದರೆ ನಾಲ್ಕನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ಸಿಗುತ್ತದೆ. ಈ ಸಂಕೆಗಳನ್ನು ಒಂದರ ಕೆಳಗೆ ಮತ್ತೊಂದು ಬರೆಯ ಬೇಕು. ಒಟ್ಟಿಗೆ ಹತ್ತು ಸಂಕೆ ಇರಬೇಕು. ಈ ಎಲ್ಲ ಕೂಡಿಸುವ ಲೆಕ್ಕವನ್ನು ಮಕ್ಕಳು ಮಾಡಬೇಕು. ಇಲ್ಲಿ ಮಾಸ್ತರರ ಕೆಲಸ, ಏಳನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ಬಂದಾಗ, ಅವರು ಹತ್ತೂ ಸಂಕೆಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ ಬರೆದು ಬಿಡುತ್ತಾರೆ. (ಗಮನಿಸಿ, ಬರೇ ಏಳು ಸಂಕೆ ಬರೆದಾಗ, ಮಾಸ್ತರರು ಹತ್ತು ಅಂಕೆಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ ಬರೆಯುತ್ತಾರೆ) ಹತ್ತೂ ಸಂಕೆ ಬರೆದು, ಅವುಗಳನ್ನು ಕೂಡಿಸಿದಾಗ, ಅವುಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ , ಮಾಸ್ತರರು ಬರೆದ ಮೊತ್ತ ಆಗಿರುತ್ತದೆ. ಅದು ಹೇಗೆಂದು, ನಾನು ಹೇಳಿ ಕೊಡುತ್ತೇನೆ. ಮೊದ ಮೊದಲು ಹುಡುಗರಿಗೆ ಆ ಗುಟ್ಟು ಹೇಳಬೇಡಿ. ಉದಾಹರಣೆಗೆ ಮೊದಲ ಹುಡುಗ ಅಂಕೆ ಎರಡು ಅನ್ನುತ್ತಾನೆ. ಮತ್ತೊಬ್ಬ ಒಂದು ಅನ್ನುತ್ತಾನೆ. ಆವಾಗ ಮೂರನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ಮೂರು ಆಗಿರುತ್ತದೆ. ನಾಲ್ಕನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆ ನಾಲ್ಕು. ಕೆಳಗೆ ವಿವರಣೆ ಇದೆ. 1)೨ 2)೧ 3)೩ --> ೨ + ೧ = ೩
4)೪ –> ೧ + ೩ = ೪
5)೭ –> ೩ + ೪ = ೭
6)೧೧ –> ೪ + ೭ = ೧೧
7)೧೮ –> ೭ + ೧೧ = ೧೮ ಈವಾಗ ನೀವು ಹತ್ತೂ ಸಂಕೆಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ ಬರೆಯಬೇಕು
8)೨೯ –>೧೧ + ೧೮ = ೨೯
9)೪೭ –>೧೮ + ೨೯ = ೪೭
10)೭೬–>೨೯ + ೪೭ = ೭೬
೧೯೮ — ಇದು ಮೇಲಿನ ಹತ್ತು ಸಂಕೆಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ.

ಏಳನೆ ಯ ಸಂಕೆಗೆ ಹನ್ನೊಂದರಿಂದ ಗುಣಿಸಿದಾಗ ಈ ಹತ್ತೂ ಸಂಕೆಗಳ ಮೊತ್ತ ಸಿಗುತ್ತದೆ
೧೮ * ೧೧ =೧೯೮

ಇದು ಆಟ ಸಹ ಆಗುತ್ತದೆ (ಮಾಸ್ತರರ ಜಾದೂ), ಮಕ್ಕಳಿಗೆ ಅಂಕೆಗಳನ್ನು ಕೂಡಿಸುವ ವೇಗ ಹೆಚ್ಚಿಸಲು ಸಹಾಯಕವಾಗಬಹುದು.

ನೀವು ವಿದ್ಯಾರ್ಥಿಗಳಿಗೆ, ಸ್ವಲ್ಪ ಸಮಯದ ನಂತರ ಈ ಗುಟ್ಟು ಹೇಳಿ ಕೊಡಿ. ನಂತರ ಅವರೇ ಆಟ ಆಡಬಹುದು. ಆವಾಗ ನಿಮ್ಮ ಪಾತ್ರ?

ನೀವು ಏಳನೆಯ ಸಂಕೆಯನ್ನು ಬರೆದು ಬಿಡಿ!

ಮೊದಲ ಅಂಕೆ A ಆದರೆ, ಎರಡನೆಯದು B ಆದರೆ, ಏಳನೆಯದು ೫A+೮B

ಮೇಲಿನ ಲೆಕ್ಕದಲ್ಲಿ ೫x೨ +೧x೮ = ೧೮

Leave a Reply